Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Joseph Hartley

Deceased

Bishop of Columbus, Ohio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1858BornDavenport, IA
10 Jul 188224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Columbus, Ohio, USA
19 Dec 190345.4AppointedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
25 Feb 190445.6Ordained BishopBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
1 Mar 190445.6InstalledBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
12 Jan 194485.5DiedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for James Joseph Hartley:
Bishop James Joseph Hartley (born , died ) Bishop of Columbus

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015