Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis William Howard

Deceased

Bishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1867Born
16 Jun 189123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Columbus, Ohio, USA
26 Mar 192355.7AppointedBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
15 Jul 192356.0Ordained BishopBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
18 Jan 194476.5DiedBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis William Howard
Bishop Francis William Howard (born , died ) Bishop of Covington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColumbus

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018