Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis O’Donaghue

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Louisville, Kentucky

Titular Bishop of Lesvi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1848BornDavies County, IN
6 Sep 187425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Vincennes, Indiana, USA
13 Feb 190051.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
13 Feb 190051.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pomaria
25 Apr 190051.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pomaria
7 Feb 191061.2AppointedBishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
29 Mar 191061.3InstalledBishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
26 Jul 192475.7RetiredBishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
26 Jul 192475.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lesvi
7 Nov 192576.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Louisville, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for Denis O’Donaghue:
Bishop Denis O’Donaghue (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Louisville

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 461

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013