Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Nashville

Dioecesis Nashvillensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • David Raymond Choby, Bishop

General Information


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
28 July 1837ErectedDiocese of Bardstown Diocese of Nashville (erected) (State of Tennessee)
20 June 1970Territory LostDiocese of Nashville Diocese of Memphis (erected)
27 May 1988Territory LostDiocese of Nashville Diocese of Knoxville (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195037,5013,250,0001.2%89301193156845555ap1951
196685,7103,883,0002.2%124361605359849475ap1967
197090,5954,015,7602.3%1224516754212349881ap1971
197657,6092,840,0002.0%7923102564254424856ap1977
198065,9812,879,0002.3%7439113583266116361ap1981
199047,3951,493,2813.2%511970677342019150ap1991
199963,3631,824,3753.5%53217485627415350ap2000
200070,5871,959,2573.6%4821691,023532515150ap2001
200173,6521,985,0233.7%4424681,083542614950ap2002
200269,4802,106,8683.3%482573951552717651ap2003
200370,6232,097,9053.4%492574954532619151ap2004
200471,1882,105,1613.4%472875949522918351ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 23 Jun 2013