Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Peter Sartain

Archbishop Emeritus of Seattle, Washington, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1952 Born
15 Jul 197826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Memphis, Tennessee, USA
4 Jan 200047.5AppointedBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
6 Mar 200047.7Ordained BishopBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
16 May 200653.9AppointedBishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
27 Jun 200654.0InstalledBishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
16 Sep 201058.2AppointedArchbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
1 Dec 201058.4InstalledArchbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
3 Sep 201967.2ResignedArchbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for James Peter Sartain
Archbishop James Peter Sartain (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Seattle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMemphis
Ordained BishopRobinson Center, Little Rock, Diocese of Little Rock, Arkansas

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Seattle.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 May 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Sep 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,712
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Jul 2021

Quantcast