Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Joseph McDonald

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Little Rock, Arkansas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1923BornSavannah
8 May 194824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Savannah-Atlanta, Georgia, USA
4 Jul 197248.6AppointedBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
5 Sep 197248.8Ordained BishopBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
7 Sep 197248.8InstalledBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
4 Jan 200076.1RetiredBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
1 Apr 201490.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Andrew Joseph McDonald:
Bishop Andrew Joseph McDonald (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Little Rock

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 1 Apr 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015