Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Joseph McDonough

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Louisville, Kentucky


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1911BornPhiladelphia, PA
26 May 193826.5Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
10 Mar 194735.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
10 Mar 194735.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thenae
30 Apr 194735.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thenae
2 Jan 195745.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
20 Feb 195745.2InstalledAuxiliary Bishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
23 Feb 196048.2AppointedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
27 Apr 196048.4InstalledBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
25 Feb 196755.2AppointedArchbishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
2 May 196755.4InstalledArchbishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
29 Sep 198169.8ResignedArchbishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
4 Aug 199886.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Louisville, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph McDonough:
Archbishop Thomas Joseph McDonough (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Louisville

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 51.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Apr 2014