Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Carroll McCormick

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Scranton, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1907BornPhiladelphia
10 Jul 193224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
11 Jan 194739.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
11 Jan 194739.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ruspae
23 Apr 194739.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ruspae
25 Jun 196052.5AppointedBishop of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA
4 Mar 196658.2AppointedBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
15 Feb 198375.1RetiredBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
2 Nov 199688.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Carroll McCormick:
Bishop Joseph Carroll McCormick (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Scranton

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 49.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015