Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cletus Joseph Benjamin

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

Titular Bishop of Binda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1909Born
8 Dec 193526.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 196051.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
17 Aug 196051.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Binda
22 Dec 196051.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Binda
15 May 196152.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Cletus Joseph Benjamin
Bishop Cletus Joseph Benjamin (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOld Forge, PA
Ordained BishopPhiladelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 25.4 years
  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,960, Number 128
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 239
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast