Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh Louis Lamb

Deceased

Bishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1890Born
29 May 191524.6Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
19 Dec 193545.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
19 Dec 193545.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Helos
19 Mar 193645.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helos
28 May 195160.6AppointedBishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
16 Jan 195261.2InstalledBishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Dec 195969.1DiedBishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Hugh Louis Lamb
Bishop Hugh Louis Lamb (born , died ) Bishop of Greensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena, PA
Ordained PriestSt. John Lateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceJeannette, Hospital, Greensburg, Diocese of Greensburg, Pennsylvania
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Saints Peter and Paul, Cathedral Basilica, Philadelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,936, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast