Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerald Vincent McDevitt

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

Titular Bishop of Tigias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1917BornPhiladelphia
30 May 194225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
22 Jun 196245.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
22 Jun 196245.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigias
1 Aug 196245.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigias
29 Sep 198063.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Gerald Vincent McDevitt:
Bishop Gerald Vincent McDevitt (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 113

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013