Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Matthew Breitenbeck

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Grand Rapids, Michigan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1914BornDetroit
30 May 194227.8Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
18 Oct 196551.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
18 Oct 196551.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tepelta
20 Dec 196551.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tepelta
6 Oct 196955.2AppointedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
2 Dec 196955.3InstalledBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
24 Jun 198974.9RetiredBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
12 Mar 200590.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Matthew Breitenbeck:
Bishop Joseph Matthew Breitenbeck (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Grand Rapids

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013