Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas John Gumbleton

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Detroit, Michigan

Titular Bishop of Ululi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1930 BornDetroit
2 Jun 195626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
8 Mar 196838.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
8 Mar 196838.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ululi
1 May 196838.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ululi
2 Feb 200676.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas John Gumbleton:
Bishop Thomas John Gumbleton (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Detroit

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Detroit.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013