Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Leopold Imesch

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Joliet in Illinois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1931BornGrosse Pointe Farms
16 Dec 195625.4Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
8 Feb 197341.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
8 Feb 197341.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pomaria
3 Apr 197341.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pomaria
30 Jun 197948.0AppointedBishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
28 Aug 197948.1InstalledBishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
16 May 200674.9RetiredBishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
22 Dec 201584.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Joliet in Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Leopold Imesch:
Bishop Joseph Leopold Imesch (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Joliet in Illinois

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 May 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 22 Dec 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016