Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Edward Fitzgerald

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Joliet in Illinois

Titular Bishop of Walla Walla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1938BornChicago
23 May 196425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Joliet in Illinois, USA
11 Jan 200263.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
11 Jan 200263.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Walla Walla
19 Mar 200263.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Walla Walla
5 Jun 200364.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
11 Sep 200364.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Joliet in Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for James Edward Fitzgerald:
Bishop James Edward Fitzgerald (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Joliet in Illinois

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,150
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013