Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Earl Alfred Boyea, Jr.

Bishop of Lansing, Michigan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1951 BornPontiac, MI
20 May 197827.1Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
22 Jul 200251.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
22 Jul 200251.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Siccenna
13 Sep 200251.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Siccenna
27 Feb 200856.9AppointedBishop of Lansing, Michigan, USA
29 Apr 200857.1InstalledBishop of Lansing, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Earl Alfred Boyea, Jr.:
Bishop Earl Alfred Boyea, Jr. (born ) Bishop of Lansing

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lansing.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013