Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Timothy Paul Andrew Broglio

Archbishop of United States of America, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1951 BornCleveland
19 May 197725.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
27 Feb 200149.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amiternum
27 Feb 200149.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic
19 Mar 200149.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amiternum
19 Nov 200755.9AppointedArchbishop of United States of America, Military
25 Jan 200856.1InstalledArchbishop of United States of America, Military

MicroData Summary for Timothy Paul Andrew Broglio:
Archbishop Timothy Paul Andrew Broglio (born ) Archbishop of United States of America, Military

Please contact the Archbishop through the Military Ordinariate of United States of America, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,936

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Nov 2014