Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Miguel Betancourt Torres, S.E.M.V.

Auxiliary Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

Titular Bishop of Cursola

Titular See: (Esclavos de la Eucaristía y de María Virgen)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1970 Born
1 Jan 199221.5EnteredMember of Other
6 Aug 200030.1Perpetual VowsMember of Other
21 Apr 200130.8Ordained PriestPriest of Other
18 Sep 201848.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
18 Sep 201848.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cursola
18 Oct 201848.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cursola

MicroData Summary for Juan Miguel Betancourt Torres
Bishop Juan Miguel Betancourt Torres S.E.M.V. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hartford

EventPlace
Birth PlacePonce, Diocese of Ponce, Puerto Rico
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Hartford, Archdiocese of Hartford, Connecticut

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Hartford.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Sep 2018
  • ob: CB, 18 Sep 2018
  • c2+: CB, 2 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 20 Oct 2018

Quantcast