Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ponce

Dioecesis Poncensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 21 November 1924
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Puerto Rico
  • Square Kilometers: 2,045 (830 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises the south portion of the Island of Puerto Rico.
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: PCE
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesisdeponce.org/
  • Mailing Address: Apartado 32205, Estación 6, Ponce, PR 00732-2205, Puerto Rico
  • Telephone: (787)848-5265
  • Fax: 841-1778

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
21 November 1924ErectedDiocese of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico) Diocese of Ponce (erected)
30 April 1960Territory LostDiocese of Ponce
Diocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico
Diocese of Arecibo (erected)
4 November 1964Territory LostDiocese of Ponce
Archdiocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico
Diocese of Caguas (erected)
1 March 1976Territory LostDiocese of Arecibo
Diocese of Ponce
Diocese of Mayagüez (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1949900,0001,000,00090.0%25881137,9649921838ap1951
1966698,968735,75695.0%491131624,31411351038ap1967
1970575,470593,56297.0%63991623,55210148045ap1971
1976653,671767,84985.1%451011464,477215236049ap1977
1980489,000543,00090.1%44771214,041714231738ap1981
1990436,000543,26580.3%51671183,694419328540ap1991
2000443,000552,12580.2%62611233,601717621540ap2001
2001483,000604,21079.9%63531164,163716321440ap2002
2002498,736624,08079.9%61531144,374696021341ap2003
2003474,759593,44880.0%65571223,891697420342ap2004
2004474,959593,54880.0%64621263,769867923042ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.6, 8 Jan 2013; data: 10 Jan 2013