Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo Antonio Suriñach Carreras

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ponce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1928BornMayagüez
13 Apr 195729.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ponce, Puerto Rico
26 May 197547.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
26 May 197547.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Mauretania
25 Jul 197547.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Mauretania
10 Nov 200072.6AppointedBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
30 Nov 200072.7InstalledBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
11 Jun 200375.2RetiredBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
19 Jan 200576.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Ponce, Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Antonio Suriñach Carreras:
Bishop Ricardo Antonio Suriñach Carreras (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ponce

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013