Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Dios López de Victoria

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico

Titular Bishop of Metropolis in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1898Born
11 Jun 192729.2Ordained PriestPriest of San Juan de Puerto Rico
1 Aug 196365.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico
1 Aug 196365.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Metropolis in Asia
3 Sep 196365.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metropolis in Asia
29 Aug 199294.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Juan de Dios López de Victoria
Bishop Juan de Dios López de Victoria (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLares

  • a priest for 65.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018