Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luis Cardinal Aponte Martínez

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of San Juan de Puerto Rico

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Madre della Providenza a Monte Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1922BornLajas
10 Apr 195027.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ponce, Puerto Rico
23 Jul 196038.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
23 Jul 196038.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lares
12 Oct 196038.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lares
16 Apr 196340.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
18 Nov 196341.3SucceededBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
22 Feb 196441.5InstalledBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
4 Nov 196442.3AppointedArchbishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico
15 Jan 196542.4InstalledArchbishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico
5 Mar 197350.6Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197350.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Madre della Providenza a Monte Verde
26 Mar 199976.6RetiredArchbishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico
10 Apr 201289.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of San Juan de Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Luis Aponte Martínez:
Cardinal Luis Aponte Martínez (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of San Juan de Puerto Rico

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 51.5 years
  • a cardinal for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 102
  • d: CB, 10 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013