Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Francisco Miranda Rivera, O. Carm.

Bishop of Fajardo-Humacao, Puerto Rico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1954 Born
15 Aug 198026.5ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
21 Sep 198329.6Solemn VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
14 Sep 198430.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
16 May 202066.3AppointedBishop of Fajardo-Humacao, Puerto Rico
15 Aug 202066.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fajardo-Humacao, Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Luis Francisco Miranda Rivera
Bishop Luis Francisco Miranda Rivera O. Carm. (born ) Bishop of Fajardo-Humacao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanturce, Diocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico
Ordained PriestSanta Teresita, Church, Santurce, Archdiocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico
Ordained BishopColiseo Marcelo Trujillo Panisse, Humacao, Diocese of Fajardo-Humacao

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fajardo-Humacao.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 May 2020
  • bd/prof/op/ob: CB, 16 May 2020
  • mn/sole: CB, 18 May 2020
  • c2+: CB, 1 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 16 Aug 2020

Quantcast