Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernard Francis Cardinal Law

Deceased

Archpriest Emeritus of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1931Born
21 May 196129.5Ordained PriestPriest of Natchez-Jackson, Mississippi, USA
22 Oct 197341.9AppointedBishop of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri, USA
5 Dec 197342.0Ordained BishopBishop of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri, USA
11 Jan 198452.1AppointedArchbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
23 Mar 198452.3InstalledArchbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
25 May 198553.5Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 198553.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
13 Dec 200271.1ResignedArchbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
27 May 200472.5AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
21 Nov 201180.0RetiredArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
20 Dec 201786.1DiedArchpriest Emeritus of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}

MicroData Summary for Bernard Francis Law (VIAF: 165267060)
Bernard Francis Cardinal Law (born , died ) Archpriest Emeritus of Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorreón, México
Ordained PriestPontifical College Josephinum, Worthington, OH
Ordained BishopSt. Agnes, Cathedral, Springfield, Diocese of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri, USA
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, St. Mary Major, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.0 years
  • a cardinal for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2011
  • d: CB, 19 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back), -4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 8 Apr 2018