Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Philip Reed

Auxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

Titular Bishop of Sufar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1959 Born
3 Jun 198424.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
6 Jul 198526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
3 Jun 201656.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
3 Jun 201656.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufar
24 Aug 201657.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufar

MicroData Summary for Robert Philip Reed
Bishop Robert Philip Reed (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Boston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoston
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Cathedral, Boston, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Boston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 Jun 2016
  • mn/c01/od: CB, 6 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,080

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast