Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arthur Leo Kennedy

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

Titular Bishop of Timidana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1942 Born
17 Dec 196624.9Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
30 Jun 201068.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
30 Jun 201068.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Timidana
14 Sep 201068.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Timidana
30 Jun 201775.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Arthur Leo Kennedy
Bishop Arthur Leo Kennedy (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoston

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Boston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,788
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jun 2017