Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter James Edyvean

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

Titular Bishop of Aeliae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1938Born
16 Dec 196426.1Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
29 Jun 200162.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
29 Jun 200162.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aeliae
14 Sep 200162.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aeliae
29 Jun 201475.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
2 Feb 201980.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Walter James Edyvean (VIAF: 208635333)
Bishop Walter James Edyvean (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedford, MA, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Cathedral, Boston, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Death PlaceMetrowest Medical Center, Natick, MA, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Buried Place (Original)Oak Grove, Cemetery, Medford, MA, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,045
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 2 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 13 Apr 2019

Quantcast