Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Anthony Dooher

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

Titular Bishop of Theveste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1943 Born
21 May 196926.0Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
12 Oct 200663.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
12 Oct 200663.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Theveste
12 Dec 200663.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theveste
30 Jun 201875.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for John Anthony Dooher
Bishop John Anthony Dooher (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDorchester
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Cathedral, Boston, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Boston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2006
  • c2+/ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,294
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Jun 2018

Quantcast