Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter John Uglietto

Auxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts

Titular Bishop of Thubursicum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1951 BornCambridge, MA
21 May 197725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
30 Jun 201058.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
30 Jun 201058.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thubursicum
14 Sep 201058.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thubursicum

MicroData Summary for Peter John Uglietto
Bishop Peter John Uglietto (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Boston

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Boston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,789

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Aug 2016