Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Richard James Cardinal Cushing

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1895BornSouth Boston
26 May 192125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
10 Jun 193943.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
10 Jun 193943.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mela
29 Jun 193943.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mela
25 Sep 194449.1AppointedArchbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
15 Dec 195863.3Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 195863.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
8 Sep 197075.0RetiredArchbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
2 Nov 197075.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Richard James Cushing:
Richard James Cardinal Cushing (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Boston

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
  • a cardinal for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 31
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 9 Oct 2014