Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eric Francis MacKenzie

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts

Titular Bishop of Alba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1893BornBoston
20 Oct 191824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
11 Jul 195056.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
11 Jul 195056.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Alba
14 Sep 195056.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alba
20 Aug 196975.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Eric Francis MacKenzie:
Bishop Eric Francis MacKenzie (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Boston

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013