Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Hamilton Pearce, S.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Suva, Fiji, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1921Born
3 Feb 194726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
29 Feb 195635.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
29 Feb 195635.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Attalea in Pamphylia
29 Jun 195635.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Attalea in Pamphylia
21 Jun 196645.4AppointedBishop of Apia, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
22 Jun 196746.4AppointedArchbishop of Suva, Fiji, Pacific (Oceania)
10 Apr 197655.2ResignedArchbishop of Suva, Fiji, Pacific (Oceania)
30 Aug 201594.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Suva, Fiji, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for George Hamilton Pearce
Archbishop George Hamilton Pearce S.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Suva

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrighton, MA, USA
Ordained BishopSt. Columbkille, Church, Brighton, MA

  • a priest for 68.5 years
  • a bishop for 59.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 57
  • d: CB, 31 Aug 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast