Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Reno

Dioecesis Renensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 21 March 1995
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of San Francisco
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Nevada
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 183,506 (70,879 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: XI (CA, HI, NV)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: RNO
  • Official Web Site: http://renodiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: 290 South Arlington Ave., Suite 200, Reno, NV 89501, USA
  • Telephone: (775)329-9274
  • Fax: 329-6009

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Reno
27 March 1931ErectedDiocese of Salt Lake
Diocese of Sacramento
Diocese of Reno (erected)
Diocese of Reno-Las Vegas
13 October 1976Name ChangedDiocese of Reno Diocese of Reno-Las Vegas
21 March 1995SplitDiocese of Reno-Las Vegas Diocese of Las Vegas
Diocese of Reno
Diocese of Reno
21 March 1995SplitDiocese of Reno-Las Vegas Diocese of Las Vegas
Diocese of Reno

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Reno
195023,100130,00017.8%48484815626ap1951
196683,172472,30117.6%6115761,0942816535ap1967
197086,000517,55316.6%5238909554917837ap1971
Diocese of Reno-Las Vegas
197695,000550,00017.3%4935841,13014713340ap1977
1980111,000654,00017.0%4948971,14416413141ap1981
1990157,0001,106,45014.2%6236981,60294710048ap1991
Diocese of Reno
199964,870527,77812.3%2511361,801833628ap2000
200066,941542,05212.3%3312451,4879153528ap2001
2001114,726573,63020.0%3511462,4948143628ap2002
2002115,138575,69020.0%339422,7418123728ap2003
2003119,716598,57820.0%359442,72010123728ap2004
200491,973607,45915.1%3210422,18911133728ap2005
2010132,982835,00015.9%437502,65925103428ap2011
2014136,900860,00015.9%435482,8522982328ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.6, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Aug 2016