Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Francis Walsh

Bishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa in California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1937 BornSan Francisco
30 Mar 196325.5Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
30 Jun 198143.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
30 Jun 198143.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigias
24 Sep 198144.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigias
3 Jun 198749.7AppointedBishop of Reno-Las Vegas, Nevada, USA
6 Aug 198749.8InstalledBishop of Reno-Las Vegas, Nevada, USA
21 Mar 199557.5AppointedBishop of Las Vegas, Nevada, USA
28 Jul 199557.8InstalledBishop of Las Vegas, Nevada, USA
11 Apr 200062.5AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa in California, USA
22 May 200062.6InstalledBishop of Santa Rosa in California, USA
30 Jun 201173.7ResignedBishop of Santa Rosa in California, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel Francis Walsh:
Bishop Daniel Francis Walsh (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa in California

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santa Rosa in California.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2011
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 665

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013