Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Juneau

Dioecesis Junellensis

United

To: Archdiocese of Anchorage-Juneau



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
23 June 1951ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Alaska Diocese of Juneau (erected)
22 January 1966Territory LostDiocese of Juneau Archdiocese of Anchorage (erected)
19 May 2020UnitedArchdiocese of Anchorage
Diocese of Juneau
Archdiocese of Anchorage-Juneau

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
19663,00040,0007.5%448375205ap1967
19683,20045,0007.1%6393553106ap1971
19764,80043,00011.2%84124004269ap1977
19805,27254,4009.7%911052771149ap1981
19906,78566,98010.1%8311616931111ap1991
19996,04374,2858.1%144183355610ap2000
20006,04973,3028.3%741154954710ap2001
20015,45373,3027.4%62868152710ap2002
20026,25073,3028.5%731062553611ap2003
20036,31872,1088.8%1021252642411ap2004
20045,36672,1087.4%921148732411ap2005
20067,35071,97010.2%72981632411ap2007
201110,22076,50013.4%6281,277239ap2012
201310,40077,90013.4%82101,0403239ap2014
201610,57479,55713.3%7291,1746239ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.4, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 26 Jun 2020

Quantcast