Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Hughes Kenny

Deceased

Bishop of Juneau, Alaska


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1937BornHollywood, CA
30 Mar 196325.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 197941.7AppointedBishop of Juneau, Alaska, USA
27 May 197941.9Ordained BishopBishop of Juneau, Alaska, USA
19 Feb 199557.6DiedBishop of Juneau, Alaska, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Hughes Kenny:
Bishop Michael Hughes Kenny (born , died ) Bishop of Juneau

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013