Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Fairbanks

Dioecesis de Fairbanks



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Alaska
27 July 1894ErectedDiocese of New Westminster
Archdiocese of Victoria
Prefecture Apostolic of Alaska (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Alaska
22 December 1916ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Alaska Vicariate Apostolic of Alaska
23 June 1951Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Alaska Diocese of Juneau (erected)
Diocese of Fairbanks
8 August 1962ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Alaska Diocese of Fairbanks

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Alaska
195011,892132,0009.0%92635339357325ap1951
Diocese of Fairbanks
196611,50075,00015.3%8243235916ap1967
197012,77588,26914.5%23537345422424ap1971
197613,820106,22513.0%336393544452727ap1977
198014,200118,60012.0%4364035526465127ap1981
199017,248127,00013.6%6263253938312642ap1991
199916,846141,75911.9%524295804041641ap2000
200017,068141,76012.0%10223253341262148ap2001
200117,132145,22311.8%11172861135212048ap2002
200217,700145,12512.2%10182863235212019ap2003
200318,931144,29113.1%9152478828181548ap2004
200417,978144,56712.4%9152474929182046ap2005
200618,000160,00011.3%121527666182047ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Nov 2013