Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Paschal Tosi, S.J. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Alaska, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1835Born
186125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Rimini, Italy
186529.6IncardinatedPriest of Society of Jesus
27 Jul 189459.2AppointedPrefect of Alaska, USA
13 Sep 189762.3ResignedPrefect of Alaska, USA
14 Jan 189862.7DiedPrefect Emeritus of Alaska, USA

MicroData Summary for Paschal Tosi
Father Paschal Tosi S.J. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Alaska

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Vito, Italy

  • a priest for 37.0 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast