Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Buffetti

Deceased

Bishop of Bertinoro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1804Born
12 Aug 182722.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 185752.7AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
13 Sep 185752.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
12 Jan 187469.2DiedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Buffetti (VIAF: 90219138)
Bishop Pietro Buffetti (born , died ) Bishop of Bertinoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMirabello, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 157
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1857, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017