Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Maria Cattani

Deceased

Bishop of Carpi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1793BornModena
21 Sep 181623.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jan 185056.3AppointedBishop of Carpi, Italy
21 Apr 185056.6Ordained BishopBishop of Carpi, Italy
28 Jan 186369.4DiedBishop of Carpi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Maria Cattani:
Bishop Gaetano Maria Cattani (born , died ) Bishop of Carpi

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1851
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,929
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 184
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,214

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013