Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Bignotti

Deceased

Bishop of Adria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1791BornRomanore
21 Dec 181423.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 185261.0AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
22 May 185361.6Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
7 Mar 185765.4DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Bignotti:
Bishop Giacomo Bignotti (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013