Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Novasconi

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1798BornCastiglione
7 Oct 182123.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 184951.2SelectedBishop of Cremona, Italy
20 May 185051.7ConfirmedBishop of Cremona, Italy
30 Jun 185051.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cremona, Italy
1867¹68.4DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Novasconi:
Bishop Antonio Novasconi (born ) Bishop of Cremona

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013