Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Riccabona de Reinchenfels

Deceased

Bishop of Trento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1807Born
1 Aug 183023.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trento, Italy
8 Aug 183023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
1 Feb 185446.8SelectedBishop of Verona, Italy
7 Apr 185447.0ConfirmedBishop of Verona, Italy
16 Jul 185447.3Ordained BishopBishop of Verona, Italy
5 Feb 186153.8SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
22 Mar 186153.9ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
26 Jun 186154.2InstalledBishop of Trento, Italy
31 Mar 187972.0DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Riccabona de Reinchenfels (VIAF: 13590677)
Bishop Benedetto Riccabona de Reinchenfels (born , died ) Bishop of Trento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCavalese, Diocese of Trento
Ordained BishopS. Maria del anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 566, and Page 587
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1854, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017