Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Corti

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1796Born
1820¹23.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 Oct 184650.4SelectedBishop of Mantova, Italy
12 Apr 184750.9ConfirmedBishop of Mantova, Italy
25 Apr 184751.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mantova, Italy
12 Dec 186872.6DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Corti (VIAF: 63163894)
Bishop Giovanni Corti (born , died ) Bishop of Mantova

EventPlace
Birth PlacePomerio
Ordained BishopS. Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 364
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017