Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Theodore Boileau, S.J. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA

Titular Bishop of Ausuccura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1912Born
13 Jun 194835.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
21 Apr 196451.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
21 Apr 196451.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
31 Jul 196451.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
25 Feb 196552.4DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA

MicroData Summary for George Theodore Boileau
Bishop George Theodore Boileau S.J. (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Fairbanks

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLothrop, MT
Ordained PriestSan Francisco, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California

  • a priest for 16.6 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast