Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Vancouver

Archidioecesis Vancuveriensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Michael Miller, C.S.B., Archbishop
  • Adam Joseph Exner, O.M.I., Archbishop Emeritus
  • Raymond Roussin, S. M., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 19 September 1908
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: British Columbia
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 119,439 (46,133 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: West (Ouest)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: Vanc
  • Official Web Site: http://www.rcav.bc.ca/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, 150 Robson St., Vancouver, B.C., V6B 2A7, Canada
  • Telephone: (604)683-0281
  • Fax: 683-4288

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of British Columbia
14 December 1863ErectedDiocese of Vancouver Island Vicariate Apostolic of British Columbia (erected)
Diocese of New Westminster
2 September 1890ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of British Columbia Diocese of New Westminster
27 July 1894Territory LostDiocese of New Westminster
Archdiocese of Victoria
Prefecture Apostolic of Alaska (erected)
Archdiocese of Vancouver
19 September 1908ElevatedDiocese of New Westminster Archdiocese of Vancouver (Name Changed and Diocese raised to an Archdiocese)
22 February 1936Territory LostArchdiocese of Vancouver Diocese of Nelson (erected)
22 December 1945Territory LostArchdiocese of Vancouver Diocese of Kamloops (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Vancouver
195067,275674,00010.0%63701335059139160ap1951
1966125,419914,25013.7%748515978816145568ap1967
1968120,0001,000,00012.0%858517070511769ap1971
1976226,5701,265,33017.9%76991751,29414135270ap1977
1980232,0001,297,00017.9%801041841,26013633670ap1981
1990305,0421,637,21418.6%89851741,753112026074ap1991
1999359,6221,993,17918.0%78961742,066112618376ap2000
2000374,7952,007,88418.7%99951941,931112614177ap2001
2001375,1352,013,90718.6%96901862,016112013877ap2002
2002376,5112,032,02418.5%98871852,035110512977ap2003
2003392,5802,181,00018.0%94871812,168110412777ap2004
2004396,8982,204,99118.0%93921852,145111513077ap2005
2010465,7172,668,09917.5%931051982,352212712077ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Aug 2014