Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Joseph D’Herbomez, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of British Columbia

Titular Bishop of Miletopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1822BornBrillon, France
23 Nov 184826.8ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
14 Oct 184927.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
22 Dec 186341.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of British Columbia, Canada
22 Dec 186341.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
9 Oct 186442.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
3 Jun 189068.4DiedVicar Apostolic of British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Louis-Joseph D’Herbomez:
Bishop Louis-Joseph D’Herbomez O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of British Columbia

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 384
  • c1: Sadlier's Catholic Directory, Year 1891, Page 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013