Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Modeste Demers

Deceased

Bishop of Vancouver Island, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1809Born
7 Feb 183626.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 184636.7AppointedBishop of Vancouver Island, USA
30 Nov 184738.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vancouver Island, USA
28 Jul 187161.7DiedBishop of Vancouver Island, USA

MicroData Summary for Modeste Demers (VIAF: 105881162)
Bishop Modeste Demers (born , died ) Bishop of Vancouver Island

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt.-Nicholas-de-Lévis, Diocese of Québec, Canada

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 581
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jan 2017