Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre-Flavien Turgeon

Deceased

Archbishop of Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1787BornQuébec
29 Apr 181022.4Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
28 Feb 183446.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Québec, Canada
28 Feb 183446.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidyma
11 Jun 183446.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidyma
3 Oct 185062.8SucceededArchbishop of Québec, Canada
25 Aug 186779.7DiedArchbishop of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Flavien Turgeon (VIAF: 56141675)
Archbishop Pierre-Flavien Turgeon (born , died ) Archbishop of Québec

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 316, and Page 346
  • bd/tbis: CB, 6 Jan 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016