Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rémi Gaulin

Deceased

Bishop of Kingston, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1787BornQuebec City
13 Oct 181124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
10 May 183345.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
10 May 183345.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thabraca
20 Oct 183346.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thabraca
14 Jan 184052.5SucceededBishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
8 May 185769.8DiedBishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Rémi Gaulin (VIAF: 11837580)
Bishop Rémi Gaulin (born , died ) Bishop of Kingston

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 321, and Page 364
  • opd/c1: CB, 18 Jan 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016